FUSION21 FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's primary objective is to tackle social and economic exclusion, supporting geographical economics and local residents within these areas to obtain social wellbeing and enhance quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£12,463,945
Donations and legacies | £4.79k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £12.19m | |
Investments | £265.06k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,854,095
Raising funds | £6.31m | |
Charitable activities | £1.51m | |
Other | £33.05k |
£326,791 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,791 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.34m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.51m | |
Retained for future use | £4.61m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.34m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.51m | |
Retained for future use | £4.94m |
People

72 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER EDWARD CORNELIUS MURRAY | Chair | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne Taylor | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Baxter | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward LIVESEY | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrea ASTBURY | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony CAHILL | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.57m | £6.14m | £7.08m | £8.51m | £12.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.74m | £4.80m | £5.48m | £7.38m | £7.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.79k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.79k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.54m | £6.12m | £7.00m | £8.41m | £12.19m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.27k | £7.58k | £435 | £35.06k | £265.06k | |
|
Income - Other | £20.83k | £15.58k | £79.81k | £72.43k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £180.94k | £573.98k | £498.63k | £1.47m | £1.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.36m | £3.90m | £4.98m | £5.91m | £6.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.54k | £16.86k | £0 | £0 | £34.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £99.13k | £518.42k | £334.56k | £415.46k | £1.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £196.20k | £327.17k | £0 | £0 | £33.05k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.01m | £1.78m | £1.92m | £977.18k | £1.19m | |
|
Long-term investments | £644.90k | £437.21k | £409.10k | £3.20m | £10.25m | |
|
Other assets | £8.68m | £10.68m | £12.17m | £11.30m | £8.91m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.51m | £1.96m | £1.74m | £1.67m | £1.79m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAR 2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT, (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND OFFENDERS, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND OFFENDERS WITH EXPERIENCE, (D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES, (E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS, (F) THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING, (G) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, (H) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE USE OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE WHO BY VIRTUE OF THEIR AGE OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WOULD NOT HAVE OTHERWISE HAVE ACCESS TO INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, (I) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY (?SOCIALLY EXCLUDED? MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY)), (J) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fusion 21
Kings Business Park
Kings Drive
PRESCOT
L34 1PJ
- Phone:
- 01514813000
- Email:
- info@fusion21.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window