Trustees APNA HAQ
Charity number: 1169502

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Oluwadamilola | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Afsa Hussain | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ansa Latif Choudry | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolina Meco | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Parveen Ali | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vathsaladevi Vasu | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shahzadi Saira Awan | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MS LANGATHANI NKOMO | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.