CHILDHOOD TUMOUR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support children and young people up to the age of 30 and their families affected by Neurofibromatosis Type 1 (NF1). We organise residential camps for children and days out for families. We are passionate about mental health and wellbeing. We work closely with health visitors to raise awareness and early diagnosis of NF1.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 February 2016: CIO registration
- CTT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunil Singh | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Ashton | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jarra | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Hodgson | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Samuel-Hubert | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Coleman | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Brooks | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Tully | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LUKE POMFRET | Trustee | 26 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.07k | £70.46k | £149.67k | £108.69k | £198.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.76k | £54.41k | £95.93k | £184.61k | £167.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Feb 2016 as amended on 09 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 24 WITH NEUROFIBROMATOSIS (NF1) AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - FUNDING AND ORGANISING SOCIAL EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES FOR THEIR BENEFIT/THAT RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS AND BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO MEET UP WITH OTHERS WITH NF1; - RAISING MONEY FOR, HELP FUND AND ORGANISE HOLIDAY CAMPS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITH NF1; - SIGNPOSTING AND LINKING PEOPLE TO THE BEST INFORMATION/RESOURCES AVAILABLE FOR NF1; - RAISING AWARENESS OF NF1 THROUGH CAMPAIGNING, WORKING ALONGSIDE OTHER ORGANISATIONS, THE NHS AND RESEARCHERS TO IMPROVE BOTH DIAGNOSIS AND BETTER CARE OF FOR PEOPLE WITH NF1; - FUNDING PEER-REVIEWED RESEARCH INTO NF1 WHERE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH ARE MADE AVAILABLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 The Close
Fairlight
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN35 4AQ
- Phone:
- 07943239019
- Website:
-
WWW.CHILDHOODTUMOURTRUST.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window