Trustees CHILDHOOD TUMOUR TRUST

Charity Number: 1165777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sunil Singh Trustee 03 March 2024
None on record
Kirsty Ashton Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Melanie Jarra Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Jodie Hodgson Trustee 02 August 2023
None on record
Kirsten Samuel-Hubert Trustee 09 March 2023
None on record
Daniel Coleman Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Brooks Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record
Joanne Tully Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
MARTIN LUKE POMFRET Trustee 26 February 2016
None on record