THE LAST KISS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support families affected by baby loss , through the provision of specialist equipment, training of midwifes in bereavement care and by providing resources and the environment conducive to the healing journey. We are committed to raising awareness of miscarriage and still birth. We aim to change perceptions around bereavement through workshops, training and support in schools and colleges.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNIKA HAZAL DEBORAH PALMER BSC | Chair | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE SOUTHAM BSC | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEELY PIERCE BSC | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.34k | £2.88k | £3.75k | £1.07k | £6.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | £7.26k | £2.76k | £760 | £5.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AMONGST PARENTS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS WHEN A BABY, CHILD, YOUNG PERSON OR ADULT DIES BY:- A)THE PROVISION OF CUDDLE COT COOLING SYSTEMS AND MOSES BASKETS AND MEMORY BOXES TO MATERNITY UNITS AND SIMILAR EQUIPMENT DESIGNED FOR OLDER CHILDREN IN HOSPICES ACROSS THE UK; B)THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO THOSE BEREAVED AND THEIR CARERS; C)WORKING COLLABORATIVELY WITH HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROFESSIONALS TO IMPROVE AND ENHANCE PROFESSIONAL PRACTICE WITH BEREAVED FAMILIES; D)MAKING DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS AS THE CHARITY THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION DEEM SUITABLE; E)THE ADVANCEMENT OF BEREAVEMENT CARE THROUGH EDUCATION, TRAINING, GRANT MAKING AND RESEARCH; F)RAISING AWARENESS THROUGH PUBLIC EVENTS AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO STILLBIRTH, MISCARRIAGE, NEONATAL DEATH, MATERNITY CARE AND THE IMPROVEMENTS NEEDED IN PERINATAL MATERNAL HEALTH; AND G)PRODUCING APPROPRIATE WRITTEN AND ELECTRONIC MATERIALS IN RESPECT OF THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Briwere Road
TORQUAY
TQ1 4DU
- Phone:
- 07539333603
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window