Financial history THREE FEATHERS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1163518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.63k £214 £275 £0 £743
Total expenditure £1.54k £382 £400 £254 £1.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A