THREE FEATHERS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's initial activities have focused on holding drama club workshops for schoolchildren in a disadvantaged area of London and producing theatrical productions for the enjoyment and education of young audiences, with the aim of fostering an interest in the theatrical arts in young children and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Poland
Governance
- 11 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Mascarello | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamasin Cook | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Alyson McGarrigle | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|||||
KAREN COLLINS | Trustee | 11 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE IMLAY | Trustee | 11 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.63k | £214 | £275 | £0 | £743 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £382 | £400 | £254 | £1.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Sep 2015 as amended on 12 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN, AND TO PROMOTE, THE ARTS OF DRAMA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Heath Road
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 8NE
- Phone:
- 07756024132
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window