THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES NEWCHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 11 August 2015: Previously excepted registration
- NEWCHAPEL ST JAMES (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Pritchard | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Phillips | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Gidman | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEAN TIDBALL | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Charles John Tidball | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lawton | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frank Harper | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joan Stubbs | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Smith | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
NANCY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONNA RAMPLING | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ELDEN | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.08k | £56.56k | £60.65k | £59.40k | £50.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.28k | £37.26k | £62.42k | £57.00k | £49.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
INC
ST. MARYS HOUSE
THE CLOSE
LICHFIELD
WS13 7LD
- Phone:
- 01543306052
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window