Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES NEWCHAPEL
Charity number: 1163088

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Pritchard | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Phillips | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Gidman | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEAN TIDBALL | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Charles John Tidball | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lawton | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frank Harper | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joan Stubbs | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Smith | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
NANCY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONNA RAMPLING | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ELDEN | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.