Financial history SWAN SUPPORT

Charity number: 1163624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £27.57k £32.32k £56.26k £51.18k £65.97k
Total expenditure £34.69k £32.23k £33.04k £41.19k £83.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A