GREENBANKS CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1165685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports people with learning disabilities to live happy and fulfilling lives by the provision of accommodation, sustenance, education, training and care, to enable the beneficiaries to contribute as far as possible to their own well-being and maintenance and to ensure that they live happy and useful lives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £322,285
Total expenditure: £722

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 February 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR STUART ABEL BSC., PHD. Chair 15 October 2016
None on record
Sally Crump Trustee 08 June 2019
THE KINGSTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time
KINGSTON CHURCH HALL (THE BARN)
Received: On time
KING GEORGE'S FIELD, KINGSTON
Received: On time
BARHAM PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
MATTHEW GURNEY Trustee 17 October 2017
None on record
Dominika Ayerst MBA Trustee 15 October 2016
None on record
MATTHEW ARCHER MA Trustee 15 October 2016
None on record
]O[PMR MICHAEL JOHN MOORE Trustee 15 October 2016
GEM 72
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE FAVERSHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTRES
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST MARY OF CHARITY CHURCH, FAVERSHAM
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE FAVERSHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTRES
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF THE FOREST OF BLEAN TRUST FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £2.45k £7.23k £6.04k £10.68k £322.29k
Total expenditure £7.38k £6.78k £633 £4.25k £722
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 05 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 15 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 PRESTON PARK
FAVERSHAM
ME13 8LH
Phone:
01795537861