PARBOLD, NEWBURGH AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable purposes of Parbold, Newburgh and District U3A are to advance education and in particular the education of people not in full time gainful employment who are in their Third Age, being the period of time after the first age of childhood dependence and the second age of full time employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 November 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mervyn Gilbert Saunders | Chair | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Mary Leaning | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Anthony Morris | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Fairhead | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Starmer | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Howard | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
DIANE SMITH | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Bennett | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS BAMBER | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.38k | £1.68k | £9.75k | £1.09k | £15.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.56k | £2.05k | £8.41k | £1.36k | £15.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 28 May 2019 as amended on 25 Aug 2020 as amended on 29 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Bramley Court
Standish
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN6 0JZ
- Phone:
- 01257427038
- Email:
- caburrows@blueyonder.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window