Financial history HALEWOOD YOUTH IN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1163441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £129.23k £130.25k £137.45k £167.21k £204.83k
Total expenditure £96.70k £100.02k £130.36k £167.80k £189.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.27k N/A N/A £9.60k £15.60k