CESTRIA U3A AT CHESTER-LE-STREET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Generally Cestria U3A exists to advance education and in particular the education of people not in full time gainful employment who are in their Third Age residing in Chester-le-Street and its surrounding locality. Cestria U3A is part of the Third Age Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 27 August 2015: Standard registration
- CESTRIA U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorna Thompson | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Parker | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Willan | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY BURTON | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hamilton | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Rule | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Morrell | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bozic MBE | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Atkinson | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE LOGAN | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Eleanor Lanigan | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHILVER | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.14k | £4.18k | £9.80k | £10.35k | £11.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.54k | £4.26k | £8.56k | £10.98k | £10.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 AUG 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Salisbury Road
DURHAM
DH1 5QT
- Phone:
- 01913890702
- Email:
- cestriau3achair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window