Financial history FACE OF JOY INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1163695
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.84k £14.45k £7.00k £5.60k £955
Total expenditure £11.40k £17.95k £12.75k £10.24k £861
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A