ECKINGTON FRIENDSHIP CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of premises for the benefit of the local community through a lease to the Oaks Community Church. Eckington Friendship Club is a membership based club providing opportunities for members to take part in social meetings and activities at the premises, day trips and holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 26 April 2016: CIO registration
- 12 March 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 12 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1115427 OAKS COMMUNITY CHURCH NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE
- 12 March 2025: Funds transferred to 700636 ASHGATE HOSPICECARE
- 12 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1143993 AGE CONCERN CHESTERFIELD AND DISTRICT
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £680 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £660 | |
|
Total expenditure | £961 | £0 | £0 | £1.75k | £1.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 26 APR 2016 AMENDED ON 05 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LOCAL GROUPS, EDUCATION, PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND TO PURSUE ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ELDERLY PEOPLE WHO LIVE IN ECKINGTON OR THE SURROUNDING AREA. (2) IN SO FAR AS THE FACILITIES ARE NOT REQUIRED TO FURTHER OBJECT 1, THEY MAY BE USED IN FURTHERANCE OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (A) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE RESIDENTS OF ECKINGTON OR THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND TEACHING. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHARITIES ACT 2011.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window