Financial history KENILWORTH & DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1164842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.80k £6.15k £111.10k £155.65k £11.18k
Total expenditure £23.36k £15.96k £106.74k £130.13k £17.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £500 N/A N/A