CREW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CREW offers walking programmes mainly for anyone at risk from cardiovascular disease but also for people with other medical conditions and social needs. CREW promotes exercise classes run by fully qualified, self-employed British Association for Cardiac Rehabilitation (BACR) or Cardiac Phase 4 rehab instructors. CREW provides defibrillators for both walks and exercise classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 August 2015: CIO registration
- CARDIAC REHABILITATION EXERCISE WALKING (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edwin Birks | Chair | 17 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jack Porteus | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pankajni Trivedi | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Warren Nicholls | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Henley | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Deborah Barton | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Young | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eilleen Connolly | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Fordham | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA GREGSON | Trustee | 28 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £40.57k | £20.09k | £10.82k | £87.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.74k | £29.08k | £29.82k | £8.64k | £8.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 07 January 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 07 January 2025 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 January 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 13 January 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 06 January 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 06 January 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND TO ASSIST IN PREVENTION AND REHABILITATION OF ALL PERSON WHO HAVE, OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF DEVELOPING CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE, RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN YORKSHIRE AND LANCASHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Pavilion View
HUDDERSFIELD
HD3 3WU
- Phone:
- 07982728548
- Email:
- crewpartners.hsg@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window