NOTTINGHAMSHIRE PRIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote equality and diversity for the public benefit and in particular the elimination of discrimination on the grounds of sexual orientation or gender identity raising the awareness of the public with regards to all aspects of discrimination in society and issues and difficulties affecting the lives of LGTB people. Celebrating diversity of LGBT communities, staging an annual LGBT festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 January 2016: CIO registration
- Nottingham Pride (Working name)
- NOTTS PRIDE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEIGH ELLIS | Chair | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
NEIL CROPLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG MARTIN | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.00k | £20.00k | £9.55k | £45.10k | £43.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £4.95k | £43.14k | £47.78k | £47.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 May 2025 | 276 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 January 2024 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 January 2024 | 179 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 September 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 September 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY AND ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANS (LGBT) PEOPLE; (2) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF LGBT COMMUNITIES; (3) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS OR SERVICES OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; (4) PRODUCING PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, MEDIA AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; (5) STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL; AND 2. SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Notts Pride C/O D & G Filters Ltd
Unit G4
Imex Enterprise Park
Wigwam Lane
Hucknall
NOTTINGH
- Phone:
- 07528472484
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window