PANAMA WILDLIFE CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Panama Wildlife Conservation is an organisation of scientists dedicated to the conservation of Panama?s natural resources, the protection of biodiversity and the study of poorly understood endangered animal and plant species within Panama. Panama Wildlife Conservation aims to create conservation and ecotourism management through the use of capacity building in Panama.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Panama
Governance
- 25 February 2016: CIO registration
- PWC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATRINA DICK | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARRY ROGERS | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
BEULAH GARNER | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr LUIS URENA | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £3.18k | £1.89k | £41.28k | £2.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.77k | £2.91k | £1.70k | £41.56k | £838 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2024 | 402 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIODIVERSITY OF PANAMA. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN PANAMA WITH PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
162 Westbourne Grove
LONDON
W11 2RW
- Phone:
- 07824507227
- Email:
- info@panamawildlife.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window