INDIGO CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Indigo Children's Fund is a small UK registered charity set up to help underprivileged children around the world. We have a particular focus on access to education, healthcare and safe accommodation. We are unique in that 100% of all funds raised are spent directly on our projects. Never, ever, on anything else.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Burma
- Nepal
- Thailand
Governance
- 25 January 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUKE DAYNES | Chair | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
GUY WARRILLOW | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
LILY MCDOUGALL | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DE BOOS | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.86k | £186.11k | £90.89k | £110.35k | £199.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.80k | £180.50k | £100.49k | £114.14k | £178.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 25 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AROUND THE WORLD BY THE SUPPORT OF PROJECTS AND THE PROVISION OF FUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Indigo Children's Fund
12 Northfields Prospect
Putney Bridge Road
Northfields
LONDON
SW18 1PE
- Phone:
- 07547240816
- Email:
- quintin@indigofund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window