Governing document PARENTS ASSOCIATION FOR SERIOUSLY ILL CHILDREN (P A S I C)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 1977 AS AMENDED 8 AUGUST 1977, 31 OCTOBER 1977, 22 OCTOBER , 22 MAY 1989, 28 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND 19 FEBRUARY 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ANY CHILD OR YOUNG PERSONSUFFERING FROM CANCER, LEUKAEMIA OR BRAIN TUMOURS, BEING DIAGNOSED OR TREATED BY NOTTINGHAM UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS (NUH). (IN THE EVENT OF THE CLOSURE OF NUH THE WORK OF P.A.S.I.C. SHALL BE TRANSFERRED TO ANY OTHER HOSPITAL OR HOSPITALS WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE BOARD SHALL HAVE SUCCEEDED TO THE FUNCTIONS OF THE HOSPITAL SO CLOSED). TO HELP RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL NEED AMONG THE PARENTS AND FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.