THE YOUNG BARNET FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEMBERSHIP ORGANISATION FOR THE COMMUNITY/VOLUNTARY SECTOR WORKING WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (0-25) IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,349,734
Donations and legacies | £242.07k | |
Charitable activities | £1.09m | |
Other trading activities | £15.17k | |
Investments | £439 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,197,927
Raising funds | £10.11k | |
Charitable activities | £1.19m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £478,689 from 2 government contract(s) and £246,256 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.11k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.19m | |
Retained for future use | £151.81k |
People

15 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 04 December 2015: CIO registration
- YBF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Beverly | Chair | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Seema Mann | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oribi Davies | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Guirao | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Aihie | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lent | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £331.77k | £706.58k | £745.41k | £1.57m | £1.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.42k | £596.94k | £704.62k | £1.54m | £1.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £478.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.42k | £226.50k | £306.76k | £898.33k | £246.26k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £166.43k | £249.80k | £258.16k | £242.07k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.17k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £3.98k | £491.24k | £1.30m | £1.09m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £229 | £439 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £536.16k | £4.37k | £10.49k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £576.16k | £683.64k | £1.52m | £1.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £20.78k | £20.98k | £20.17k | £10.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.40k | £1.45k | £4.50k | £5.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £305.51k | £303.10k | £1.30m | £553.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £270.35k | £583.51k | £773.89k | £846.47k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £57.29k | £329.66k | £235.61k | £156.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, AND THE SUPPORT OF FAMILIES IN NEED, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING THE EFFECTIVENESS AND EFFICIENCY OF CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS WILL INCLUDE: A. ENHANCING THE CAPACITY AND RESOURCES OF VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS TO HELP ACHIEVE POSITIVE OUTCOMES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE / FAMILIES; B. FACILITATING PARTNERSHIP AND CO-OPERATION IN THE VOLUNTARY / COMMUNITY SECTOR WITHIN BARNET AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS; C. PARTICIPATE AND PROMOTE TRANS-EUROPEAN EXCHANGE AND PARTNERSHIP PROJECTS TO DEVELOP CULTURAL UNDERSTANDING AND LEARNING FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; D. TO SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES TO MEMBERS TO DEVELOP NEW SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE TO HELP THEM SUPPORT CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE /FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old East Barnet Library
85 Brookhill Road
East Barnet
EN4 8SG
- Phone:
- 02036216090
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window