THE BURTON AT BIDEFORD

Charity number: 1165520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education and the arts in particular by the establishment of a museum and art gallery which promotes public knowledge, enjoyment and appreciation of the arts, local heritage and learning.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £435,499
Total expenditure: £419,140

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BURTON ART GALLERY & MUSEUM (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Hugo Millward Chair 15 April 2021
None on record
Samuel Thomas Laughton Astill Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Kati Russell Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Robert Kevin Woolley Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Nicholas John Beer Trustee 22 April 2021
None on record
Jeremy Paul Sharpe Trustee 15 April 2021
None on record
Sarah Marie Lawrence Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
Benjamin James Liddell Trustee 08 August 2019
None on record
Ian Huggett Trustee 09 October 2017
EXETER CATHEDRAL MUSIC FOUNDATION (CIO)
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £391.78k £415.97k £421.11k £423.05k £435.50k
Total expenditure £371.40k £366.69k £396.03k £409.73k £419.14k
Income from government contracts £173.35k £169.78k £140.00k £140.00k £140.00k
Income from government grants £83.60k £83.60k £95.98k £90.14k £86.14k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Burton Art Gallery & Museum
Kingsley Road
BIDEFORD
EX39 2QQ
Phone:
01237471455