Accounts and annual returns BOLTON WOMENS AID FORTALICE

Charity number: 506784
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 22 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 23 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 23 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 26 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 03 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 13 November 2006 On Time