SIR SAMUEL OSBORN'S DEED OF GIFT (RELIEF FUND)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 10 November 1977: Standard registration
- 03 January 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.70k | £10.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.37k | £12.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 16 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 29 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | 19 April 2006 | 73 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | 08 July 2005 | 153 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12TH OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
IS THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE TO PERSONS WHO ARE OFFICERS, EMPLOYEES, FORMER OFFICERS OR FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE COMPANY OR ANY OF ITS SUBSIDIARIES AND THE SPOUSES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, LINEAL ANCESTORS LINEAL DESCENDANTS, ADOPTED CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF ANY SUCH PERSONS. 2) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OF BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THESES IN NEED. 3) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS: A) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR B) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window