Financial history MALVERN FESTIVAL CHORUS

Charity number: 506787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 14/07/2023 14/07/2024
Total gross income £26.00k £8.36k £13.54k £25.58k £27.23k
Total expenditure £22.60k £4.84k £14.16k £27.19k £28.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A