MALVERN FESTIVAL CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established to advance the education in, and appreciation of, music in Malvern and the surrounding district. To achieve this by instruction in the relevant skills and the presentation of concerts and other relevant activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 September 1977: Standard registration
- MALVERN MUSICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN ILSLEY | Chair | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Street | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gray | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Richardson | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alice Osmond | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joy Black | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edwina Ward | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TWEEDIE | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET CORLETT | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Moss | Trustee | 15 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Little | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 14/07/2023 | 14/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.00k | £8.36k | £13.54k | £25.58k | £27.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.60k | £4.84k | £14.16k | £27.19k | £28.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 July 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES SEPTEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 1977 AND 10 MARCH 1987, 13 JULY 1999 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 2009. as amended on 08 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION A ND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC IN MALVERN AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY INSTRUCTION IN THE RELEVANT SKILLS AND THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER RELEVANT ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Wykewane
Malvern
WR14 2XD
- Phone:
- 01684564366
- Email:
- moss-thomas@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window