SUSTAINABLE MEDICAL CHARITIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the protection and promotion of good health in particular by the establishment of health clinics and on-going support to deliver basic healthcare in communities, initially in The Gambia, where the existing facilities are either non-existent or inadequate to meet the reasonable needs of the local population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- The Gambia
Governance
- 10 February 2016: CIO registration
- SMCI (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SETH DUMAS RANKIN | Chair | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Thompson | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES WHITELEY | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2018 | 01/05/2019 | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.21k | £120 | £160 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 453 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 453 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 17 April 2023 | 412 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1184 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 17 April 2023 | 777 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF HEALTH CLINICS AND ON-GOING SUPPORT TO DELIVER BASIC HEALTHCARE IN COMMUNITIES, INITIALLY IN THE GAMBIA, WHERE THE EXISTING FACILITIES ARE EITHER NON-EXISTENT OR INADEQUATE TO MEET THE REASONABLE NEEDS OF THE LOCAL POPULATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Charminster Avenue
Merton Park
London
SW19 3EL
- Phone:
- 07788412128
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window