SURREY SPECIAL NEEDS SKI AND OUTDOOR LEARNING CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are the relief of young people between the ages of 5 and 20 with disabilities and or special needs by the provision of facilities and information for recreation or other leisure time occupation, in particular through the provision of skiing activities. Our main activity is the annual Ski Trip to Prato Nevoso in Italy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 February 2016: CIO registration
- SPENSOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN Leslie COTTLE MBE | Chair | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jason Matthew Foster | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Louise Rome | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ailsa Wendy Georgina Rea | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Oliver-Catt | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN DRURY | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANN REEVES | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.95k | £486 | £15 | £54.48k | £96.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.01k | £13.35k | £96 | £59.43k | £109.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5-20 WITH DISABILITIES AND/OR SPECIAL NEEDS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND INFORMATION FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SKIING ACTIVITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 BELL MEADOW
GODSTONE
RH9 8ED
- Phone:
- 01883741916
- Email:
- trip-info@spensol.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.