SALWAY EVANGELICAL CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission Salway Evangelical Church is to live for Jesus Christ in accordance with the Word of God, and to proclaim Him in the power of the Holy Spirit. Its vision and objective is that local people should become part of the Christian family, worshipping God and working to extend his Kingdom in the local community and worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 28 August 2015: CIO registration
- 31 March 2017: Funds received from 1073878 SALWAY EVANGELICAL CHURCH TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Patricia Thrower | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Thomas | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregor Barham | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Craig Tranfield | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LESLIE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 28 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW ROBERT POPLE | Trustee | 28 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP IAN ALBON | Trustee | 28 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.62k | £115.64k | £110.18k | £179.78k | £135.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.84k | £132.73k | £129.79k | £141.46k | £123.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salway Evangelical Church
Forest Approach
Woodford Green
IG8 9BW
- Phone:
- 02085059619
- Email:
- trustees@salway.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window