THE MARIAN PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity works with young people training them and raising awareness on relationship matters to allow them to make an informed choice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46k | £441 | £363 | £295 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO ABUSE AND EXPLOITATION IN RELATIONSHIPS BY: 1. CHALLENGE MISCONCEPTIONS SURROUNDING ABUSE 2. PROVIDING TRAINING TO YOUNG WOMEN ALREADY ENGAGED WITH EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS (UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE, SCHOOLS), PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE USE OF WORKSHOPS AND SEMINARS IN ORDER FOR THEM TO MAKE SAFER AND MORE INFORMED LIFE STYLE CHOICES. 3. PROVIDING TRAINING TO EDUCATIONAL PROVIDERS IN ORDER TO RAISE AWARENESS, INFORM ABOUT THE SIGNS OF ABUSIVE RELATIONSHIPS AND HOW TO SUPPORT A YOUNG PERSON WHO MAY BE IN SUCH A RELATIONSHIP. 4. PROVIDING TRAINING TO YOUNG WOMEN AND/OR THEIR CARERS THROUGH THE USE OF WORKSHOPS IN A VARIETY OF SETTINGS SUCH AS HOSTELS, PRISONS AND YOUTH CENTRES IN ORDER FOR THEM TO MAKE SAFER AND MORE INFORMED LIFESTYLE CHOICES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window