BEAT SCAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BEAT SCAD ACTIVITIES FOCUS ON THREE MISSION AREAS: 1) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE UNCOMMON AND UNDER-DIAGNOSED HEART CONDITION SPONTANEOUS CORONARY ARTERY DISSECTION (SCAD) BY SHARING UP TO DATE INFORMATION; 2) SUPPORTING PEOPLE AFFECTED BY SCAD THROUGH CONFERENCES, ORGANISED WALKS & SOCIAL MEDIA GROUPS; 3) RAISING FUNDS FOR RESEARCH TO UNDERSTAND THE CAUSE AND TO OPTIMIZE TREATMENT AND PROGNOSIS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Louise Breslin | Chair | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Coombes | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE OLIVER | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.84k | £52.80k | £44.79k | £91.67k | £71.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.42k | £52.85k | £72.39k | £28.72k | £13.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, TO ADVANCE HEALTH IN PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE AFFECTED BY SPONTANEOUS CORONARY ARTERY DISSECTION (SCAD) BY: (A) SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF SCAD; (B) RAISING AWARENESS OF SCAD; AND (C) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO SCAD SURVIVORS AND THEIR FAMILIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Ridd Way
Wingerworth
CHESTERFIELD
S42 6UX
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- contactus@beatscad.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window