Financial history FULHAM SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1163234
Charity reporting is overdue by 916 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.88k £7.68k £8.69k £7.67k £7.15k
Total expenditure £13.73k £8.99k £8.18k £7.65k £6.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A