AYLSHAM COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aylsham Community Partnership was set up in November 2006 and it focuses on the advancement of education through the Aylsham Heritage Centre and the improvement of the environment through Aylsham in Bloom. The Partnership preserved an historic Grade II listed building to provide a Heritage Centre for residents and visitors to Aylsham for local-history exhibitions and talks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 April 2016: Standard registration
- ACP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILES WILLIAM MARGARSON | Chair | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Lindsay Little | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Margaret Sadler | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Preston | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY BERNARD SADLER | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.00k | £21.86k | £12.12k | £20.73k | £16.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.54k | £12.47k | £13.87k | £16.65k | £21.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | £4.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JUN 2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AYLSHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURING PARISHES. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AYLSHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURING PARISHES.
Area of benefit
AYLSHAM AND NEIGHBOURING PARISHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 PROUDFOOT WAY
AYLSHAM
NORWICH
NR11 6WE
- Phone:
- 01263732090
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window