Financial history DAR AL-HADI FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1165684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/02/2020 21/02/2021 21/02/2022 21/02/2023 21/02/2024
Total gross income £56.91k £40.42k £45.16k £40.44k £48.78k
Total expenditure £63.04k £36.38k £26.91k £44.52k £61.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A