Financial history Christ Centered International Church

Charity number: 1165058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £103.13k £78.98k £69.27k £55.83k £48.92k
Total expenditure £55.82k £42.97k £38.76k £50.41k £53.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A