To Live In H.O.P.E.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To live in Hope is an UK based charity operating in Ghana to improve the lives of the people in the country by providing and improving the education of children, providing basic necessities including water and sanitation and the training of parents in some economic activities to improve their income to allow long term financial sustainability, improved health and a brighter future for the children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
Governance
- 09 June 2016: CIO registration
- ENLIVEN MAMA AFRICA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Thomas Manners | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Manners | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Abrahams | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Page | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Charles Ward | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chi Wai Man | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES CLARK | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.11k | £24.90k | £58.69k | £41.94k | £156.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.73k | £24.63k | £32.48k | £68.34k | £125.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Jun 2016 as amended on 17 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN GHANA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT
Area of benefit
IN GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 14
Faraday Court
Rankine Road
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG24 8PF
- Phone:
- 07704389787
- Website:
-
toliveinhope.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window