Accounts and annual returns DEEPER GRACE CHURCH

Charity number: 1168460
Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 March 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 12 March 2022 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 March 2022 395 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 March 2022 395 days late Download Open in new window