DEEPER GRACE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Deeper Grace Church endeavours to advance the Christian faith for the public benefit by holding services every Sunday morning, Homecell Bible Studies every Thursday and different, "speacial" programmes between that every month. For example, 'Young Wise'. A new youth organised division of the church. We believe in community and the unity community activities like these build.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Ghana
Governance
- 27 July 2016: CIO registration
- IMPULSE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GODWIN ADONU | Chair | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA DOMFEH | Trustee | 28 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMA GOGO BRUKU BSC | Trustee | 28 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN ADU-ADJEI BSc,MA | Trustee | 28 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.78k | £16.02k | £13.76k | £15.73k | £19.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.36k | £26.51k | £12.83k | £15.35k | £15.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | £2.42k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 March 2022 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 395 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 395 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Jul 2016 as amended on 05 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Centre
90-96 High Street North
LONDON
E6 2HT
- Phone:
- 07590655446
- Email:
- deepergracech@gmail.com
- Website:
-
youngandwisedpgc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window