THE ELLA BEAR FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve needs of young disabled people through providing or assisting in the provision of equipment and recreational items designed to improve their conditions of life To help young disabled people, especially but not exclusively through providing equipment or providing services that will aid in improving their quality of life and ease of everyday living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 03 September 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIRSTY ANGHARAD MURRAY | Chair | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR ROB GLEED | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY MURRAY | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12 | £518 | £31 | £58 | £37 | |
|
Total expenditure | £440 | £487 | £485 | £436 | £179 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND RECREATIONAL ITEMS DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO HELP YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH PROVIDING EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES THAT WILL AID IN IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE AND EASE OF EVERYDAY LIVING. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF GLOUCESTER ROYAL HOSPITAL CHILDREN'S CENTRE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES) (ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE DOCTORS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Marling Way
Great Oldbury
STONEHOUSE
Gloucestershire
GL10 3WQ
- Phone:
- 07703061768
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window