Financial history NEUADD BENTREF LLANDDONA VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 506824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £67.01k £910 £11.03k £15.62k £20.01k
Total expenditure £86.85k £21.85k £11.80k £11.66k £12.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.37k N/A N/A N/A £5.97k