WORCESTER FESTIVAL CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Worcester Festival Choral Society is one of the leading promoters of major concerts in Worcester. As well as being one of the oldest, it is one of the most highly regarded choirs in the country, with a singing membership of about 150. It gives three major concerts each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 October 1977: Standard registration
- 14 June 2022: Funds received from 517532 MIDLAND FESTIVAL CHORUS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Margaret White | Chair | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
BARBARA ANNE FORD | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES GREENWOOD | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.77k | £12.79k | £58.97k | £64.65k | £69.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.84k | £19.00k | £50.57k | £62.35k | £64.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 1988
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CHORAL CONCERTS DURING A FESTIVAL SEASON AND AT OTHER TIMES AS OCCASION MAY ARISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
174 Cheltenham Road
EVESHAM
Worcestershire
WR11 2LW
- Phone:
- 01386 40246
- Email:
- baf.hoc@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window