THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, CROXLEY GREEN, DIOCESE OF ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1165115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support to the parish clergy in providing Christian religious services within the Anglican Church open to the whole community, pastoral visiting and educational outreach work within All Saints' Parish. Use of other parish charity funds to relieve poverty and need within and outside the Parish. Donations to other charities . Use of the Church Hall as a meeting venue.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £161,593
Total expenditure: £163,765

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 2016: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ALL SAINTS' PCC, CROXLEY GREEN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MIRIAM RUTH MUGAN Chair 13 November 2007
GEORGE GURNEY CHARITY FOR THE SICK POOR
Received: On time
THE REVEREND DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS TRUST
Received: On time
CHURCHES IN CROXLEY GREEN CIO
Received: On time
Gillian Main Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Rev PAUL PALMER Trustee 01 July 2021
CHURCHES IN CROXLEY GREEN CIO
Received: On time
JANE MARGARET BATES Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
ANDREW DAVID NOBBS Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Samantha Clair Jones Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
ANN PALMER Trustee 27 September 2020
None on record
SAM BEARD Trustee 27 September 2020
None on record
FRANCES JANE BENNETT Trustee 27 September 2020
None on record
ANNE FRANCES OKE Trustee 27 September 2020
THE REVEREND DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS TRUST
Received: On time
GEORGE GURNEY CHARITY FOR THE SICK POOR
Received: On time
LYNDON DAVID PALMER Trustee 27 September 2020
GEORGE GURNEY CHARITY FOR THE SICK POOR
Received: On time
THE REVEREND DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher James Fagan Trustee 07 April 2018
THE REVEREND DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN GALLOWAY Trustee 07 April 2018
None on record
JANET PATRICIA MARTIN Trustee 07 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £136.73k £112.77k £117.92k £118.32k £161.59k
Total expenditure £262.68k £115.46k £92.82k £120.70k £163.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
75 Windmill Drive
Croxley Green
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 3FB
Phone:
01923720319