Netmakers

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.1 the advancement of the Christian faith; 1.2 the relief of those in need because of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage; 1.3 the relief of social isolation and promotion of social inclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 October 2015: CIO registration
- HARROGATE HUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Wynn James | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Allison Barker | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Philip Gee | Trustee | 02 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Ben Askew | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|||||
CAROL DIANE BRACHER | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.37k | £28.89k | £4.26k | £5.62k | £20.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.36k | £302.65k | £24.93k | £36.21k | £41.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Oct 2015 as amended on 08 May 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; 3.2 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; 3.3 THE RELIEF OF SOCIAL ISOLATION AND PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o St Peter's Church
Cambridge Road
Harrogate
HG1 1PB
- Phone:
- 01423369395
- Email:
- sam@netmakers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window