Financial history CUCKFIELD LAWN TENNIS CLUB

Charity number: 1170569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.25k £16.20k £16.92k £19.11k £22.36k
Total expenditure £7.19k £6.32k £10.97k £10.11k £17.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A