ESSEX CHAMBER ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Essex Chamber Orchestra, popularly known as ECHO, comes together three times a year for intensive weekend rehearsals followed by a concert, usually at venues in Essex. Although originally conceived as a chamber orchestra, ECHO varies its forces to perform a wide variety of programmes ranging from Baroque and Classical works to the repertoire of the 20th Century.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 12 January 2016: Standard registration
- ECHO (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Lovelock | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Simnett | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Price | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Smith | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Judith Arnill | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE HARDEN | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN EVERSDEN | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Craig | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.79k | £1 | £6.00k | £15.58k | £21.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.11k | £260 | £7.34k | £16.98k | £18.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 APR 1998 AS AMENDED ON 10/01/2016
Charitable objects
A) THE OBJECTS OF THE ORCHESTRA SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SEES FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hollies
Archer Street
Bishop Norton
Market Rasen
Lincolnshire
- Phone:
- 07879348994
- Email:
- elaine.harden1603@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window