Financial history BASELESS FABRIC THEATRE

Charity number: 1165923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £61.07k £50.33k £41.96k £38.20k £58.21k
Total expenditure £55.30k £10.51k £28.45k £84.36k £14.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £3.66k N/A £4.86k £9.98k