INSPIRE SCHOOLS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We serve schools and churches in communicating Christian based teaching through assemblies, workshops, holiday clubs and special one off programmes. Children are encouraged to explore views on certain topics and to appreciate those of others, linking in with the British Values, SEAL etc. We deliver training in the UK and provide resources to equip others including a range of children?s books
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 January 2016: Standard registration
- 27 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2018 | 01/01/2019 | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.86k | £7.10k | £6.92k | £1.24k | £1.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.20k | £7.36k | £7.59k | £1.02k | £1.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 AUG 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE ("THE OBJECTS"): (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SUBJECT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION (WITHOUT RESTRICTION TO ANY PARTICULAR RELIGION); AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH DOCTRINES OUTLINED IN THE APOSTLE'S CREED - THAT IS BELIEF IN/OF/THAT: 1. GOD, THE FATHER ALMIGHTY, CREATOR OF HEAVEN AND EARTH. 2. JESUS CHRIST, HIS ONLY SON, OUR LORD. 3. JESUS CHRIST WAS CONCEIVED BY THE POWER OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AND BORN OF THE VIRGIN MARY. 4. JESUS CHRIST SUFFERED UNDER PONTIUS PILATE, WAS CRUCIFIED, DIED, AND WAS BURIED. 5. JESUS CHRIST DESCENDED TO THE DEAD. ON THE THIRD DAY HE ROSE AGAIN. 6. JESUS CHRIST ASCENDED INTO HEAVEN AND IS SEATED AT THE RIGHT HAND OF THE FATHER. 7. JESUS CHRIST WILL COME AGAIN TO JUDGE THE LIVING AND THE DEAD. 8. THE HOLY SPIRIT, 9. THE HOLY CATHOLIC CHURCH, THE COMMUNION OF SAINTS, 10. THE FORGIVENESS OF SINS, 11. THE RESURRECTION OF THE BODY, 12. LIFE EVERLASTING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window