GURDWARA NANAK SAR, GURU NANAK SIKH ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives and aims of the Guru Nanak Sikh Organisation (hereafter called the Gurdwara) is to promote the teachings of the Sikh religion and to establish, organise and maintain for all persons whether members or not, religious and educational services and facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £56,091 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 18 May 1978: Standard registration
- GURDWARA NANAK SAR, GURU NANAK SIKH ORGANIZATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jarnail Singh | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Santokh Singh Dhillow | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harjit Kaur | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUKHJINDER KAUR | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RANJIT SINGH | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MANJIT KAUR | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.78k | £110.61k | £231.94k | £223.87k | £327.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.82k | £93.51k | £115.49k | £153.27k | £232.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.93k | N/A | £43.29k | £56.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 1978, AS AMENDED 17 OCT 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FURTHER AND TO TEACH THE SIKH RELIGION IN GENERAL AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THAT FAITH WITHIN THE AREAS OF WALSALL, WEDNESBURY, DARLASTON AND WILLENHALL IN THE METROPOLITAN COUNTY OF THE WEST MIDLANDS IN PARTICULARY. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
MAINLY WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN COUNTY OF THE WEST MIDLANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NANAK SAR SIKH TEMPLE
WELLINGTON STREET
WALSALL
WS2 9QR
- Phone:
- 01922 641040
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window